U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bumpus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport - Notice of Disposition]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Supervision]
  • September 08, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • April 28, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.