U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parkinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.