U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 25, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 25, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 29, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.