U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Barnett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Release From Custody]
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.