U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cobble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue Criminal Trial - No Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue Criminal Trial - No Motion]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Volk]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.