U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shephard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 15, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 14, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2021: [Suppress]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detain]
  • May 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.