U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Mills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing Scheduled - Continued]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal Highly Sensitive Document]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Criminal Trial - No Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Volk]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • July 30, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • July 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • June 14, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.