U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Witness List]
  • October 07, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Paperless Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detain]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.