U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing Scheduled - Continued]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue Criminal Trial - No Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Witness List]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • September 24, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 02, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Volk]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2021: [Witness List]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.