U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00084-19
  • Case Name: USA v. Burks, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Court Fee Paid]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (APPEAL)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reduce Sentence]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • March 20, 2025: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Records Request]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 23, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2024: [Suppress]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Release from Custody]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • October 11, 2024: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 10, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2024: [Request to Discontinue E-mail Notification]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Petition]
  • October 09, 2024: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.