U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bork
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order (SEALED)]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.