U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00039-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Houston, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Status Report ]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order (PUBLIC)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.