U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cool
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.