U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00014-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodwine, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Public Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (SEALED)]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order (PUBLIC)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.