U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.