U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00034-7
  • Case Name: USA v. BUTLER, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 01, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2025: [Witness List]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • March 17, 2025: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 18, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Suppress]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.