U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00036-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Westfall, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 25, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 21, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 20, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 12, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
October, 2024
  • October 27, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Paperless Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.