U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00029-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ward, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.