U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00061
  • Case Name: In re: Weirton Medical Center Data Breach Litig.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.