U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Boczek v. Pentagon Federal Credit Union d/b/a PENFED
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Report of Mediator]
November, 2024
  • November 27, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.