U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Pennington et al v. Design 1 Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.