U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Shambaugh v. The Potomac Edison Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.