U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Foundation Against Intolerance & Racism, Inc. v. Pickens et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.