U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Gains v. Antero Resources Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.