U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00103
  • Case Name: MARINA 1, LLC v. LAKE LYNN GENERATION, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.