U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Farmer v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.