U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00181
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 07, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.