U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Keimauri McGee v. Wolfe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 26, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.