U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Shields v. Tibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.