U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Loftis v. Walmart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Other Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.