U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Ali v. Lumico Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Argument Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report of Mediator]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Other Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.