U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Allman v. Tibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [In Limine]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 28, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 22, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability]
  • April 17, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.