U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Dietrich v. Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Argument Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Objections]
  • February 14, 2025: [Other Document]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.