U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Marshall County Board Of Education et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.