U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Faini et al v. Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 17, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.