U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 16, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 10, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Paperless Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2025: [Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.