U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Deavers et al v. Walmart, Inc., d/b/a Walmart Super Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Other Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Other Document]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.