U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Zitun v. Blinken et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.