U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Scott v. HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 09, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 10, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 12, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 05, 2025: [Appear]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.