U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Isra El v. USAA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 08, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 05, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.