U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Mackey v. Tibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.