U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Moats v. Costello et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.