U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00232
  • Case Name: Armstrong v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Case Transfer Complete]
  • May 07, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability]
  • March 11, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.