U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Marsh v. Garrett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Order (NOT PRETRIAL)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.