U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Cain v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Report of Mediator]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Consent to Mediation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.