U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Adams v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.