U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Morris v. Harron et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [First Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.