U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Kinder et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Return Receipt]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.