U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Shaw v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 11, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 11, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.