U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Quesenberry ex rel United States of America v. Wheeling Park Commission
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2025: [Return Receipt]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Return Receipt]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Return Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.